WebOct 17, 2024 · Before becoming secretary of defense, Gates spent nearly 27 years at the National Security Council and the CIA which he ran under President George H.W. Bush. … WebFeb 26, 2024 · Gates served as director of Central Intelligence from 1991 until 1993. He is the only career officer in CIA’s history to rise from entry-level employee to director.
Cia: Is Gates Finished? - Newsweek
WebFeb 27, 2024 · Robert Gates, the former US Secretary of Defense and CIA Director, joins Fareed to discuss why the invasion of Ukraine is a departure from Russian President Vladimir Putin's previous military... WebJun 12, 2024 · Gates, who was secretary of defense from 2006 to 2011 under Presidents George W. Bush and Barack Obama, spoke with NPR about his new book, Exercise of Power: American Failures, Successes, … compare apples with apples
Politics keeps the U.S. from securing private-sector networks, says ...
Robert Michael Gates (born September 25, 1943) is an American intelligence analyst and university president who served as the twenty-second United States secretary of defense from 2006 to 2011. He was originally appointed by President George W. Bush and was retained by President Barack Obama. … See more Gates was born in Wichita, Kansas, the son of Isabel V. (née Goss) and Melville A. "Mel" Gates. Gates attained the rank of Eagle Scout in the Boy Scouts of America (BSA) and received the Distinguished Eagle Scout Award See more 1993–1999 After retiring from the CIA in 1993, Gates worked as an academic and lecturer. He evaluated student theses for the International Studies Program … See more Bush Administration On November 8, 2006, after the 2006 midterm election, President George W. Bush announced his intent to nominate Gates to succeed the resigning Donald Rumsfeld as U.S. Secretary of Defense. Gates was … See more As deputy director and director of America's leading intelligence agency for many years, Gates and his CIA staff have been faulted for … See more Positions While at Indiana University, Gates was recruited by the Central Intelligence Agency and joined in 1966. On January 4, 1967, he was commissioned as a Second Lieutenant in the United States Air Force after attending See more On September 6, 2011, it was announced that Gates had accepted the position of chancellor at the College of William & Mary, succeeding Sandra Day O'Connor for a seven-year term. He took the office of the chancellor on February 3, 2012. In September 2024, … See more Gates' awards and decorations include: Government awards • Presidential Medal of Freedom • Presidential Citizens Medal See more WebThe functions of this position were served by the Deputy Director of Central Intelligence (DDCI) until that position was abolished under the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004. The position of DD/CIA was created administratively by then-D/CIA Porter Goss and received statutory approval from the U.S. Congress in 2010. Rear Admiral Roscoe H. Hillenkoetter was the third director of central intelligence, but the first who served as the Director of the Central Intelligence Agency. During his tenure, a National Security Council Directive on Office of Special Projects, June 18, 1948, (NSC 10/2) further gave the CIA the authority to carry out covert operations "against hostile foreign states or groups or in support of friendly foreign states or groups but which are so planned and conducted that any US Govern… compare apple watch and fitbit